Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 14 Online
» 3919 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17325 Week
» 70341 Month
» 189868 Year
» 3216721 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2153 |
27/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03153 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 08/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
27/06/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
0000 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Unknown: Trieste, Italy |
|
|
27/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2153 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
25/02/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to West Hartlepool (51C) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
08/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03153 |
|
|
08/11/1975 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03153 |
|
|