Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 561 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 13967 Week
» 66983 Month
» 186510 Year
» 3213363 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2154 |
01/07/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03154 |
02/02/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 05/1971 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/07/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/07/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2154 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Darlington (51A) |
|
|
03/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Thornaby (51L) |
|
|
05/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
02/02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03154 |
|
|
07/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
10/1977 |
Reinstated |
Reinstated to Lincoln (LN) |
|
|
10/1977 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
11/1977 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
11/09/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03154 |
|
|
05/11/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|