Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 91 Today
» 1162 Yesterday
» 6018 Week
» 4756 Month
» 419077 Year
» 1640642 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2163 03/10/1960  
TOPS (Tops) 03163 01/01/1973  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0303/10/1960
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 03/10/1960 to York (North) (50A)
Withdrawn 14/01/1976
Time in Service 15 yrs, 3 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 01/08/1976
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
50A York (North) (New) on 03/10/1960
52E Percy Main w/e 15/10/1960
52G Sunderland w/e 26/11/1960
52E Percy Main w/e 08/06/1963
52A Gateshead w/e 21/09/1963
   Withdrawn on 14/01/1976


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
03/10/1960 To Service To service as British Railways Number D2163
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to York (North) (50A)
   
15/10/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
26/11/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Sunderland (52G)    
08/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Percy Main (52E)    
21/09/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Gateshead (52A)    
01/01/1973 Renumbered Renumbered to 03163 (Tops)    
14/01/1976 Withdrawn Condemned as 03163    
01/08/1976 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev