Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 554 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19465 Week
» 84419 Month
» 287083 Year
» 3313936 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2173 |
14/12/1960 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
14/12/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
14/12/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2173 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bradford Hammerton Street (56G) |
|
|
22/04/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
04/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Knottingley (56A) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
21/08/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
10/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Botanic Gardens (50C) |
|
|
01/11/1973 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2173 |
|
|
03/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|