Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 12 Online
» 829 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14235 Week
» 67251 Month
» 186778 Year
» 3213631 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2180 |
01/02/1962 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
03180 |
01/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
03 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
0-6-0 |
Builder |
Swindon Works |
To Service |
01/02/1962 to Hither Green (73C) |
Withdrawn |
31/03/1984 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 1 mth , 30 dys |
Status |
Preserved |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
08/1968 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
01/02/1962 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
08/1968 |
x |
Dual brakes |
|
|
|
Preservation
Current Status |
Unknown |
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
01/02/1962 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2180 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
17/12/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Feltham (70B) |
|
|
14/09/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
01/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 03180 |
|
|
12/07/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stratford (SF) |
|
|
13/09/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Colchester (CR) |
|
|
09/1981 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (NR) |
|
|
31/03/1984 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 03180 |
|
|