Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 130 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17933 Week
» 70949 Month
» 190476 Year
» 3217329 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2198 |
22/06/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/06/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/06/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2198 Built at Swindon Works Allocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
01/10/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
02/11/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H) |
|
|
15/03/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
28/03/1970 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
22/11/1970 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2198 |
|
|
03/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|