Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 22 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2097 Week
» 27458 Month
» 260378 Year
» 1925754 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 2201 on 28/07/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 322
To Service Mon 28/07/1939
Withdrawal Mon 15/06/1964
Service Life 24 yrs, 10 mths , 18 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 01/1965

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 28/07/1939
MCH   Machynlleth 4w/e 31/12/1949
85A   Worcester 4w/e 26/12/1953
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 30/01/1954
82B   St Philips Marsh 4w/e 27/03/1954
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 14/06/1958
81E   Didcot 4w/e 27/02/1960
84A   Stafford Road 4w/e 25/02/1961
89B   Croes Newydd 4w/e 17/06/1961
84D   Leamington 4w/e 07/10/1961
81E   Didcot 4w/e 24/02/1962
81D   Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 25/01/1964
     Withdrawn on 15/06/1964

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MCH Machynlleth 4w/e 31/12/1949
ALLOC 85A Worcester 4w/e 26/12/1953
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 5w/e 30/01/1954
ALLOC 82B St Philips Marsh 4w/e 27/03/1954
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 17/05/1958
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 14/06/1958
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 27/02/1960
ALLOC 84A Stafford Road 4w/e 25/02/1961
ALLOC 89B Croes Newydd 4w/e 17/06/1961
ALLOC 84D Leamington 4w/e 07/10/1961
ALLOC 81E Didcot 4w/e 24/02/1962
ALLOC 81D Reading (W.R.) 4w/e 27/01/1964
WDN   w/e 08/07/1964

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1959 Brecon demotion Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. SLS/196002

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
28/07/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2201
Built at Swindon Works
   
31/12/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (MCH)    
26/12/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Worcester (85A)    
30/01/1954 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
27/03/1954 Allocation Reallocated to St Philips Marsh (82B)    
17/05/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
27/02/1960 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
25/02/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Stafford Road (84A)    
17/06/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Croes Newydd (89B)    
07/10/1961 Allocation Reallocated to Leamington (84D)    
24/02/1962 Allocation Reallocated to Didcot (81E)    
25/01/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Reading (W.R.) (81D)    
15/06/1964 Withdrawn Condemned as 2201    
01/1965 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev