Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 14 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2089 Week
» 27450 Month
» 260370 Year
» 1925746 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 2207 on 29/08/1939

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 322
To Service Thu 29/08/1939
Withdrawal Thu 12/01/1961
Service Life 21 yrs, 4 mths , 14 dys

Disposal
Scrapping During 06/1961

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 29/08/1939
85D   Kidderminster 4w/e 16/05/1953
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 24/03/1956
     Withdrawn on 12/01/1961

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 85D Kidderminster 4w/e 16/05/1953
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 24/03/1956
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 21/04/1956
WDN   m/e 31/01/1961

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
02/11/1959 Brecon demotion Brecon's allocation was divided from 2nd November, 1959-2219/36, 3638, 3706/47/67, 7794 to Newport (86A) and 46506/16/8/9/20/1/2 to Oswestry (89A) thus making the shed an overnight stabling depot. SLS/196002
19/02/1961 Swindon Works (Works Yard) Gas Works Sidings: 1502/9, 1603/52, 3638/49, 3704, 4203, 5103/10/76, 6752/3/61/76, 7740, 8406/76, 9400/14/47/9/58, 9795. Stock Shed Yard: 1361/4, 1410/33/54, 4644, 5920, 6158, 6336, 7410/3, 7761, 8473. Triangle: 1366, 2227, 3799, 4170, 4287, 4587, 4978, 5207, 5519, 6425, 6864, 6979, 7704/76, 8457. Works Yard: 1014/25, 1625/9, 2207, 2516, 4099, 4701, 4902/15/81/5, 5025, 6003, 6131, 6945/53/61, 7000/20, 7325, 7775/94, 7902, 8454, 9481, 9701/49, 18000, 78000/8, L.T.E. L91. 'A' Shop: D604, D800/9/11/8/20/66-70, D1000-5, D2187-92, D3000/27, D3182, D6301/3/5, 7, 1017, 3806, 4073/4, 4128/31/48, 4274, 4574, 4919/24/7/30/5/54, 5008/19/27/9/32/68/71, 5900/23/72/85/6, 6023/7/9, 6122/44/7, 6368, 6822/51, 6917/29/36/51, 7033, 7908, 15100/4, 70024, 82032/9, 92232. Dump: 1601/2/10/20/59, 2813/9/32, 4550/9/94, 5331/91, 5510/4, 6333/52, 6775, 8419, 9462. 'C' Shop: 1616/44, 2846, 4281, 6382. SLS/196104
28/05/1961 Swindon Works (Dump) Gas Works: 4203, 5103/10/76, 9414. Stock Shed Yard: D817, D6319/21, 5815. Triangle: 1361/2/4, 1433, 1647, 3657/67/70/7, 3724, 5001, 6027, 6959, 8457, 8705, 9762. Works Yard: D804/38, D2144/88/91/6, D7000, 1029, 1501/2/9, 1604, 2516, 2884, 4090, 4950/72/8/85, 5022/97, 5949/58, 6004, 6937/62, 7007, 7221, 7304/40, 7761/75, 9400, 9749, 82031, 92226/45. Weigh House: D808, 4984. 'A' Shop: D602, D801/15/8/36/40/3/50/69/70, D1000-7, D2195/7-9, D2372-4, D3257, D6305/9, 3817, 4088, 4264/75, 4704, 4912/4/42/70/88/94, 5015/51/70/2/99, 5914/48/51/3/70/87, 6020, 6333/72, 6828/44/50, 6911/69/77/9, 7002/9/32/6, 7232/3, 13187, 13256/62, 15100/2, 82020/1, 92234. Dump: 1366, 1419/31/54/73, 2207/27, 3676, 5158/75/94, 5771/91, 6426, 7748, 8429, 8722/6/40/69/77, 9735/81. 'C' Shop: 5207, 8101. Field: 78001/8. SLS/196107

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
29/08/1939 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2207
Built at Swindon Works
   
16/05/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (85D)    
24/03/1956 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
12/01/1961 Withdrawn Condemned as 2207    
06/1961 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev