Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 13 Online
» 599 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3525 Week
» 5263 Month
» 132706 Year
» 1798082 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11131 15/10/1955  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2225 03/10/1959  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3' 6" engines15/10/1955
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 15/10/1955 to Stratford (30A)
Withdrawn 19/04/1969
Time in Service 13 yrs, 6 mths , 4 dys
Cut Up 01/07/1985
Cut At National Coal Board (Wath)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) on 15/10/1955
9D Newton Heath w/e 18/07/1964
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968
   Withdrawn on 19/04/1969


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
15/10/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 11131
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
03/10/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to 2225    
18/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
19/04/1969 Withdrawn Condemned as 2225    
01/07/1985 Scrapped Broken up by National Coal Board: Wath    

prev prev