Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 533 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3459 Week
» 5197 Month
» 132640 Year
» 1798016 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Post 1948 (1955 Num) 11134 27/11/1955  
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2228 31/10/1959  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 04
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
3' 6" engines27/11/1955
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
To Service 27/11/1955 to Stratford (30A)
Withdrawn 13/07/1968
Time in Service 12 yrs, 7 mths , 16 dys
Cut Up 01/01/1979
Cut At Bowaters (Sittingbourne)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
30A Stratford (New) on 27/11/1955
9D Newton Heath w/e 18/07/1964
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968
   Withdrawn on 13/07/1968


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
27/11/1955 To Service To service as British Railways Number 11134
Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd.
Allocated to Stratford (30A)
   
31/10/1959 Renumbered Renumbered to 2228    
18/07/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
13/07/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 2228    
01/01/1979 Scrapped Broken up by Bowaters: Sittingbourne    

prev prev