Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 19 Online
» 3626 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17032 Week
» 70048 Month
» 189575 Year
» 3216428 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11220 |
10/04/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2250 |
05/03/1962 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
10/04/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
10/04/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11220 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
08/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Dover Marine (74C) |
|
|
10/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2250 |
|
|
12/10/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
18/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
13/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2250 |
|
|
06/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Pounds: at Fratton TMD |
|
|