Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 23 Online
» 1433 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19236 Week
» 72252 Month
» 191779 Year
» 3218632 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11224 |
26/04/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2254 |
31/10/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
26/04/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
26/04/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11224 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
11/03/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
31/10/1961 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2254 |
|
|
27/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Guildford (70C) |
|
|
11/06/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2254 |
|
|
07/1967 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by British Rail: at Selhurst MPD |
|
|