Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 703 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 14109 Week
» 67125 Month
» 186652 Year
» 3213505 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11226 |
20/09/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2256 |
23/02/1963 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/09/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/09/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11226 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
05/03/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
23/02/1963 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2256 |
|
|
24/06/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
27/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
29/09/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2256 |
|
|
08/1969 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Pollock and Brown: Southampton |
|
|