Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 352 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14395 Week
» 79349 Month
» 282013 Year
» 3308866 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11227 |
28/09/1957 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2257 |
02/11/1963 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
28/09/1957 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Performance Statistics (Form E.R.O 3666)
Year |
Annual Mileage |
Cumulative Mileage |
Fuel Oil Utilised |
Approximate Miles/Gallon |
Classified Wait Repair |
Classified Wait Works |
Classified On Works |
Classified Total (Wkdys) |
Running Repairs |
Running Repair & Exams Cost |
Wkdys Not Required for Service |
Wkdys Stored Serviceable |
Wkdys Stored Unserviceable |
Total Weekdays Unavailable |
1956 |
18,227 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
1957 |
28,783 |
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
28/09/1957 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11227 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Plymouth Friary (72D) |
|
|
31/12/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
01/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
01/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
28/05/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Faversham (73E) |
|
|
02/11/1963 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2257 |
|
|
27/01/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ashford (73F) |
|
|
14/01/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2257 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Pollock and Brown: Southampton |
|
|