Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 1591 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19394 Week
» 72410 Month
» 191937 Year
» 3218790 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2268 |
13/02/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
13/02/1958 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
13/02/1958 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2268 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
08/03/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Royston (55D) |
|
|
17/10/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
09/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
13/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
15/09/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hull Dairycoates (50B) |
|
|
09/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Goole (50D) |
|
|
10/06/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2268 |
|
|
11/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by T W Ward: Beighton |
|
|