|
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced |
Report Date | Title | Report | Source |
---|---|---|---|
04/03/1962 | Wolverhampton Stafford Road Works (Works Yard) | Erecting Shop: 1011 (82B), 2287 (89C), 3622, 3677 (82B), 3692 (87B), 3708 (86G), 3833 (86A), 4122 (87H), 4179, 4696, 5774, 5901/77, 6110, 6125 (87H), 6137/50, 6326 (88A), 6972 (82B), 6974/6/92, 7200 (87F), 7236, 7804 (87G), 9623 (82B), 9782, 75024, 92227 (88A). Works Yard: 1451 (83C), 2268 (82D), 2856, 4140, 4608, 7807 (89D), 9633 (83C), D3037, D3977. | SLS/196204 |
Date | Event | Details | Source | See Also |
---|---|---|---|---|
06/1930 | To Service | To service as Great Western Railway Number 2268 Built at Swindon Works |
||
15/06/1947 | Allocation | Allocation Snapshot - Taunton (TN) | ||
16/07/1955 | Allocation | Reallocated to Westbury (82D) | ||
14/06/1964 | Allocation | Reallocated to Machynlleth (6F) | ||
22/05/1965 | Withdrawn | Condemned as 2268 | ||
02/1966 | Scrapped | Scrapped |