Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 8 Online
» 8 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2083 Week
» 27444 Month
» 260364 Year
» 1925740 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 2281 on 10/01/1936

Locomotive Specifics
Designer C. Collett
Class 2251
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 298
To Service Wed 10/01/1936
Withdrawal Wed 25/11/1959
Service Life 23 yrs, 10 mths , 15 dys
Information Partnered with an ex-30xx ROD tender when new

Disposal
Scrapping During 12/1960

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) on 10/01/1936
KDR   Kidderminster 4w/e 30/10/1948
GLO   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 25/12/1948
KDR   Kidderminster 4w/e 29/01/1949
HFD   Hereford 4w/e 05/11/1949
85B   Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 25/01/1958
89C   Machynlleth 4w/e 14/06/1958
     Withdrawn on 25/11/1959

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 30/10/1948
ALLOC GLO Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 25/12/1948
ALLOC KDR Kidderminster 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC HFD Hereford 4w/e 05/11/1949
ALLOC 85B Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 25/01/1958
ALLOC 89C Machynlleth 4w/e 14/06/1958
WDN   m/e 30/11/1959

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/01/1936 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2281
Built at Swindon Works
   
30/10/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
25/12/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (GLO)    
29/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Kidderminster (KDR)    
05/11/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Hereford (HFD)    
25/01/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Gloucester Horton Road (85B)    
14/06/1958 Allocation Reallocated to Machynlleth (89C)    
25/11/1959 Withdrawn Condemned as 2281    
12/1960 Scrapped Scrapped    

prev prev