Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 16 Online
» 873 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18676 Week
» 71692 Month
» 191219 Year
» 3218072 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2291 |
15/05/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
15/05/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
15/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2291 Built at Drewry Car Co. Ltd. Allocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
03/05/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
09/11/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Eastleigh (71A) |
|
|
24/12/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2291 |
|
|
07/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Pollock and Brown: Southampton |
|
|