Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 2088 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 19891 Week
» 72907 Month
» 192434 Year
» 3219287 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D230 |
07/09/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40030 |
02/1974 |
|
Names Carried
Name |
Date From |
SCYTHIA |
22/04/1961 |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
07/09/1959 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
10/03/1971 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/09/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
10/03/1971 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
14/06/1964 |
Severe |
|
Not known |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
06/08/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
Freight working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/09/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D230 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
19/09/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
22/04/1961 |
Naming |
Named 'SCYTHIA' |
|
|
28/11/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Camden (1B) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Willesden (1A) |
|
|
03/01/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe Diesel (5A) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Stoke Division (D05) |
|
|
29/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
10/03/1971 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40030 |
|
|
29/04/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40030 |
|
|
04/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Crewe, Cheshire |
|
|