Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 10 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2085 Week
» 27446 Month
» 260366 Year
» 1925742 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 105 m/e 06/1908
Great Western Railway (1922) 236 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5132
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal Mon 12/01/1953
Service Life 44 yrs, 7 mths , 12 dys
Total Mileage 745,262

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 18/04/1953 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1908
88F   Treherbert m/e 31/10/1951
88C   Barry w/e 06/09/1952
     Withdrawn on 12/01/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88F Treherbert m/e 31/10/1951
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 06/09/1952
WDN   m/e 31/01/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 105
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5132
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 236    
31/10/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
06/09/1952 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
12/01/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 236    
18/04/1953 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev