Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 19 Online
» 511 Today
» 1028 Yesterday
» 3437 Week
» 5175 Month
» 132618 Year
» 1797994 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2378 22/09/1961  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0322/09/1961
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 22/09/1961 to Derby (17A)
Withdrawn 13/06/1971
Time in Service 9 yrs, 8 mths , 22 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1972
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) on 22/09/1961
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 29/07/1967
87A Landore w/e 03/04/1971
   Stored q/e 22/05/1971
   Withdrawn on 13/06/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
22/09/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 2378
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
29/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
03/04/1971 Allocation Reallocated to Landore (87A)    
22/05/1971 To Store To Store    
13/06/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 2378    
01/10/1972 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev