Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 37 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4664 Week
» 6402 Month
» 133845 Year
» 1799221 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2379 11/10/1961  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0311/10/1961
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
To Service 11/10/1961 to Derby (17A)
Withdrawn 11/05/1968 off Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)
Time in Service 6 yrs , 7 mths
Cut Up 01/02/1970
Cut At Locomotive Works (Swindon)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
17A Derby (New) on 11/10/1961
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 29/07/1967
   Withdrawn on 11/05/1968


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
11/10/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 2379
Built at Swindon Works
Allocated to Derby (17A)
   
29/07/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
11/05/1968 Withdrawn Condemned as 2379 from Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
01/02/1970 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev