Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 32 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4659 Week
» 6397 Month
» 133840 Year
» 1799216 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2389 26/04/1961  
TOPS (Tops) 03389 02/02/1974  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0326/04/1961
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 26/04/1961 to Gorton (9G)
Withdrawn 06/02/1983
Time in Service 21 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys
Cut Up 23/07/1983
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
9G Gorton (New) on 26/04/1961
8C Speke Junction w/e 12/10/1963
9A Longsight w/e 06/08/1966
9D Newton Heath w/e 20/04/1968
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968
8H Birkenhead Mollington Street w/e 20/07/1968
41E Staveley (Barrow Hill) w/e 07/12/1968
SF Stratford 2w/e 04/12/1976
LN Lincoln m/e 31/10/1979
   Withdrawn on 06/02/1983


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
26/04/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 2389
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Gorton (9G)
   
12/10/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C)    
06/08/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
20/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
20/07/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Birkenhead Mollington Street (8H)    
07/12/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Staveley (Barrow Hill) (41E)    
02/02/1974 Renumbered Renumbered to 03389    
04/12/1976 Allocation Reallocated to Stratford (SF)    
31/10/1979 Allocation Reallocated to Lincoln (LN)    
06/02/1983 Withdrawn Condemned as 03389    
23/07/1983 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev