Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 33 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4660 Week
» 6398 Month
» 133841 Year
» 1799217 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2391 15/06/1961  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0315/06/1961
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 15/06/1961 to Gorton (9G)
Withdrawn 22/11/1970
Time in Service 9 yrs, 5 mths , 7 dys
Cut Up 01/10/1971
Cut At Cohens (Kettering)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
9G Gorton (New) on 15/06/1961
8B Warrington Dallam w/e 06/07/1963
8A Edge Hill w/e 28/11/1964
9A Longsight w/e 01/10/1966
9D Newton Heath w/e 20/04/1968
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 18/05/1968
   Stored w/e 07/03/1970
   Withdrawn on 22/11/1970


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
15/06/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 2391
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Gorton (9G)
   
06/07/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
20/04/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Newton Heath (9D)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
07/03/1970 To Store To Store    
22/11/1970 Withdrawn Condemned as 2391    
01/10/1971 Scrapped Broken up by Cohens: Kettering    

prev prev