Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 2 Online
» 28 Today
» 802 Yesterday
» 4655 Week
» 6393 Month
» 133836 Year
» 1799212 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Type Number Date From Notes
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) D2392 16/06/1961  

Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built 03
Subclass/Rebuild History
ClassFrom
0316/06/1961
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Doncaster Works
To Service 16/06/1961 to Gorton (9G)
Withdrawn 19/06/1971
Time in Service 10 yrs , 3 dys
Cut Up 01/02/1972
Cut At C F Booth (Rotherham)
Status Scrapped

Allocations
Code Name Date From
9G Gorton (New) on 16/06/1961
8B Warrington Dallam w/e 29/06/1963
8A Edge Hill w/e 28/11/1964
9A Longsight w/e 01/10/1966
10A Carnforth w/e 03/06/1967
8J Allerton w/e 18/05/1968
12C Barrow in Furness w/e 17/01/1970
8F Springs Branch (Wigan) w/e 28/03/1970
   Withdrawn on 19/06/1971


Summary
Start Event Details Source See Also
16/06/1961 To Service To service as British Railways Number 2392
Built at Doncaster Works
Allocated to Gorton (9G)
   
29/06/1963 Allocation Reallocated to Warrington Dallam (8B)    
28/11/1964 Allocation Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A)    
01/10/1966 Allocation Reallocated to Longsight (9A)    
03/06/1967 Allocation Reallocated to Carnforth (10A)    
18/05/1968 Allocation Reallocated to Allerton (8J)    
17/01/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Barrow in Furness (12C)    
28/03/1970 Allocation Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F)    
19/06/1971 Withdrawn Condemned as 2392    
01/02/1972 Scrapped Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham    

prev prev