Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 1770 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15176 Week
» 68192 Month
» 187719 Year
» 3214572 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2396 |
23/08/1961 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
23/08/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
23/08/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2396 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Monument Lane (21E) |
|
|
15/08/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Oxley (2B) |
|
|
11/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bescot (2F) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2396 from Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
11/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Cohens: Kettering |
|
|