Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 34 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 17837 Week
» 70853 Month
» 190380 Year
» 3217233 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2398 |
30/09/1961 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
by 08/1968 |
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/09/1961 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/09/1961 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2398 Built at Doncaster Works Allocated to Hither Green (73C) |
|
|
01/02/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Weymouth Radipole (GWR) (71G) |
|
|
09/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Bournemouth (70F) |
|
|
08/1968 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front with black chevrons |
|
|
31/10/1971 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2398 |
|
|
08/1972 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Pounds: at Fratton TMD |
|
|