Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 13 Online
» 843 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18646 Week
» 71662 Month
» 191189 Year
» 3218042 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D245 |
16/11/1959 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40045 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
16/11/1959 to Gateshead (52A) |
Withdrawn |
01/08/1976 |
Time in Service |
16 yrs, 8 mths , 16 dys |
Cut Up |
03/1977 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Derby) |
Information |
Surplus to requirements,poor condition,required for spares |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
16/11/1959 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
03/1970 |
|
EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
16/11/1959 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
03/1970 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
EQ Brakes |
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
25/04/1964 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Oil impregnated dirt or waste |
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
16/11/1959 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D245 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Gateshead (52A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
28/01/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (56B) |
|
|
16/09/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
07/10/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carnforth (10A) |
|
|
11/05/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Allerton (8J) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
03/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: EQ Brakes Added |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40045 |
|
|
06/07/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
11/01/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
07/02/1976 |
To Store |
To Store |
|
|
26/06/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
01/08/1976 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40045 |
|
|
03/1977 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Derby |
|
|