Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 16 Online
» 947 Today
» 1097 Yesterday
» 3216 Week
» 22117 Month
» 22117 Year
» 1687493 Total
Record: 1668 (12/02/2017)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Great Western Railway 2515   03/1897

Locomotive Specifics
Designer W. Dean
Class Dean Goods
Company History GWR
Wheels 0-6-0
Builder Swindon Works
Order Number 107
Works Number 1556
To Service During 03/1897
Withdrawal Thu 05/02/1953
Service Life 55 yrs, 11 mths , 7 dys

Allocations
Code Name From Date
  (New) m/e 03/1897
   Withdrawn on 05/02/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC LYD Lydney 4w/e 27/12/1947
ALLOC GLO Gloucester Horton Road 4w/e 21/02/1948
ALLOC LYD Lydney 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC HFD Hereford 4w/e 23/04/1949
WDN   m/e 28/02/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
03/1897 To Service To service as Great Western Railway Number 2515
Built at Swindon Works, Works Number 1556
   
05/02/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 2515    

prev prev