Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 22 Online
» 958 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18761 Week
» 71777 Month
» 191304 Year
» 3218157 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D255 |
11/01/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40055 |
04/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators Early form of ETH |
|
To Service |
11/01/1960 to Derby (17A) |
Withdrawn |
14/11/1982 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 10 mths , 3 dys |
Cut Up |
05/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Due classified repair,power unit problems |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
11/01/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
05/02/1972 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/01/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
05/02/1972 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 03/1973 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/01/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D255 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Derby (17A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
23/01/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
26/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Loaned to Camden (1B) |
|
|
02/07/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Carlisle Upperby (12B) |
|
|
28/05/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
25/11/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
09/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
01/05/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Healey Mills (55C) |
|
|
05/02/1972 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
11/11/1972 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
03/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
03/1973 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/07/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
04/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40055 |
|
|
10/05/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (LO) |
|
|
10/01/1976 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
14/11/1982 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40055 |
|
|
05/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|