Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 489 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19400 Week
» 84354 Month
» 287018 Year
» 3313871 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11136 |
07/10/1955 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2550 |
09/08/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
07/10/1955 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/10/1955 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11136 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
21/07/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
09/08/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2550 |
|
|
27/07/1963 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
23/10/1966 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2550 |
|
|
11/1966 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|