Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 5 Online
» 345 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18148 Week
» 71164 Month
» 190691 Year
» 3217544 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11139 |
08/02/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2553 |
16/04/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
08/02/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
08/02/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11139 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
24/03/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
20/07/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
19/10/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
19/07/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
13/09/1958 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/04/1960 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2553 |
|
|
24/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
03/06/1961 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
06/01/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2553 |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|