Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 9 Online
» 737 Today
» 4469 Yesterday
» 14780 Week
» 79734 Month
» 282398 Year
» 3309251 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11141 |
05/06/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2555 |
06/09/1958 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/06/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/06/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11141 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
20/10/1956 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
16/02/1957 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Ipswich (32B) |
|
|
06/09/1958 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2555 |
|
|
30/05/1959 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Yarmouth South Town (32D) |
|
|
12/03/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Lowestoft (32C) |
|
|
23/06/1962 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Parkeston Quay (30F) |
|
|
05/02/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
13/01/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2555 |
|
|
06/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by C F Booth: Rotherham |
|
|