Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 20 Online
» 2911 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16317 Week
» 69333 Month
» 188860 Year
» 3215713 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Post 1948 (1955 Num) |
11162 |
11/10/1956 |
|
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2559 |
16/05/1959 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
11/10/1956 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
11/10/1956 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number 11162 Built at Hunslet Engineering Co. Ltd. Allocated to Norwich Thorpe (32A) |
|
|
16/05/1959 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 2559 |
|
|
17/09/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) |
|
|
24/06/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Haymarket (64B) |
|
|
01/07/1967 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2559 |
|
|
29/07/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Speke Junction (8C) (Never arrived - withdrawn while en-route) |
|
|
03/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|