Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 24 Online
» 983 Today
» 4397 Yesterday
» 18786 Week
» 71802 Month
» 191329 Year
» 3218182 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D277 |
30/05/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40077 |
03/1974 |
|
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
30/05/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 06/1969 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
30/05/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
30/05/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
30/05/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
Fires
Date of Fire |
Severity |
Damage |
Source of Fire |
Material |
Details |
Location |
08/05/1970 |
Not severe |
|
Brake block sparks |
Fuel or lubricating oil sprays or leaks |
Passenger working |
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
30/05/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D277 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
11/06/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (50A) |
|
|
12/10/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
30/05/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
06/1969 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
22/11/1969 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
03/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40077 |
|
|
11/10/1975 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (GD) |
|
|
17/06/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40077 |
|
|
04/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|