Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 4227 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 17633 Week
» 70649 Month
» 190176 Year
» 3217029 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D2770 |
05/09/1960 |
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
05/09/1960 |
v |
Vacuum brakes |
|
|
|
|
Works Visits
Where Repaired |
Date Stopped |
Days Since Last Stopped |
Works Entry |
Departure |
Class of Repair |
Waiting Repair Decision |
Waiting Works |
On Works |
Total Duration |
Cost of Repair |
Mileage |
Notes |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
30/01/1961 |
18/03/1961 |
Heavy Casual |
|
|
|
48 days |
|
1,058 |
DLRC |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
10/07/1961 |
07/09/1961 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
60 days |
|
2,528 |
DLRC |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
24/01/1963 |
16/02/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
24 days |
|
|
DLRC |
Cowlairs Works |
|
n/a |
23/04/1963 |
18/05/1963 |
Light Casual |
|
|
|
26 days |
|
|
DLRC |
St. Rollox Works |
|
n/a |
17/12/1964 |
12/02/1965 |
Unclassified |
|
|
|
58 days |
|
|
DLRC |
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
05/09/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D2770 Built at North British Locomotive Company, Glasgow, Works Number 28023 Allocated to Parkhead (65C) |
|
|
19/11/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Kipps (65E) |
|
|
30/01/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Heavy Casual) - Arr: 30/01/1961. Dep: 18/03/1961. |
|
|
10/07/1961 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 10/07/1961. Dep: 07/09/1961. |
|
|
24/01/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 24/01/1963. Dep: 16/02/1963. |
|
|
23/04/1963 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - Cowlairs Works (Light Casual) - Arr: 23/04/1963. Dep: 18/05/1963. |
|
|
17/12/1964 |
Works Visit |
Works Visit - St. Rollox Works (Unclassified) - Arr: 17/12/1964. Dep: 12/02/1965. |
|
|
03/02/1968 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 2770 from Eastfield (65A) |
|
|
10/1968 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Campbells: Airdrie |
|
|