Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 990 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2064 Week
» 27425 Month
» 260345 Year
» 1925721 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 1 m/e 07/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 278 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2529
To Service During 07/1910
Withdrawal Mon 28/05/1951
Service Life 40 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys
Total Mileage 656,178

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 08/09/1951 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1910
CVFDL     8w/e 23/03/1946
     Withdrawn on 28/05/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FDL Ferndale 4w/e 23/02/1946
WDN   m/e 31/05/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 1
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2529
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 278    
23/03/1946 Allocation      
28/05/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 278    
08/09/1951 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev