Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 17 Online
» 3087 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 16493 Week
» 69509 Month
» 189036 Year
» 3215889 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Company |
Number |
|
Date From |
Taff Vale Railway |
1 |
m/e |
07/1910 |
Great Western Railway (1922) |
278 |
4w/e |
10/1922 |
Locomotive Specifics
Designer |
T. Hurry Riches |
Class |
O4 |
Company History |
TVR/GWR |
Wheels |
0-6-2T |
Builder |
Vulcan Foundry |
Order Number |
No Order ID issued |
Works Number |
2529 |
To Service |
During 07/1910 |
Withdrawal |
Mon 28/05/1951 |
Service Life |
40 yrs, 10 mths , 28 dys |
Total Mileage |
656,178 |
|
Allocations
Code |
Subsequent Codes |
Name |
|
From Date |
|
|
(New) |
m/e |
07/1910 |
CVFDL |
|
|
8w/e |
23/03/1946 |
CV.FDL |
|
Ferndale |
on |
15/06/1947 (Snapshot) |
|
|
Withdrawn |
on |
28/05/1951 |
SLS Allocations*
Type |
Code |
Name |
|
From Date |
ALLOC |
FDL |
Ferndale |
4w/e |
23/02/1946 |
WDN |
|
|
m/e |
31/05/1951 |
* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced
|
Summary
Date |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
07/1910 |
To Service |
To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 1 Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2529 |
|
|
10/1922 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 278 |
|
|
23/03/1946 |
Allocation |
|
|
|
15/06/1947 |
Allocation |
Allocation Snapshot - Ferndale (CV.FDL) |
|
|
28/05/1951 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 278 |
|
|
08/09/1951 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon |
|
|