Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 15 Online
» 621 Today
» 4868 Yesterday
» 19532 Week
» 84486 Month
» 287150 Year
» 3314003 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D281 |
20/06/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40081 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
20/06/1960 to York (North) (50A) |
Withdrawn |
13/02/1983 |
Time in Service |
22 yrs, 7 mths , 24 dys |
Cut Up |
m/e 09/1983 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Loss of power,too costly to repair |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
20/06/1960 |
BFYE |
BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
by 03/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
23/08/1969 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
20/06/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
23/08/1969 |
xb |
Dual brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
20/06/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D281 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to York (North) (50A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
25/03/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Gateshead (52A) |
|
|
23/08/1969 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
30/05/1970 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to York (North) (55B) |
|
|
03/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to BR Blue bodywork, full yellow cab front |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40081 |
|
|
13/02/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40081 |
|
|
09/1983 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|