Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 4 Online
» 27 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2102 Week
» 27463 Month
» 260383 Year
» 1925759 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 9 m/e 07/1908
Great Western Railway (1922) 282 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5128
To Service During 07/1908
Withdrawal Mon 14/06/1954
Service Life 45 yrs, 11 mths , 15 dys
Total Mileage 713,654

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 14/08/1954 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1908
86C   Cardiff Canton 8w/e 03/11/1951
86J   Aberdare 4w/e 21/02/1953
     Withdrawn on 14/06/1954

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 86C Cardiff Canton 8w/e 03/11/1951
ALLOC 86J Aberdare 4w/e 21/02/1953
WDN   m/e 30/06/1954

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1908 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 9
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5128
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 282    
03/11/1951 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Canton (86C)    
21/02/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Aberdare (86J)    
14/06/1954 Withdrawn Condemned as 282    
14/08/1954 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev