Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 9 Online
» 999 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2073 Week
» 27434 Month
» 260354 Year
» 1925730 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 17 m/e 08/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 283 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Vulcan Foundry
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 2532
To Service During 08/1910
Withdrawal Mon 14/03/1949
Service Life 38 yrs, 7 mths , 11 dys
Total Mileage 353,784

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 21/05/1949 at Locomotive Works (Caerphilly)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 08/1910
THT   Treherbert m/e 30/04/1948
BRY   Barry 4w/e 04/09/1948
     Withdrawn on 14/03/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC FDL Ferndale 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC THT Treherbert m/e 30/04/1948
ALLOC BRY Barry 4w/e 04/09/1948
WDN BRY Barry m/e 31/03/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
08/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 17
Built at Vulcan Foundry, Works Number 2532
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 283    
30/04/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (THT)    
04/09/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (BRY)    
14/03/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 283    
21/05/1949 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Caerphilly    

prev prev