Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 953 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2027 Week
» 27388 Month
» 260308 Year
» 1925684 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 38 m/e 04/1907
Great Western Railway (1922) 285 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Manning, Wardle & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1698
To Service During 04/1907
Withdrawal Mon 24/08/1953
Service Life 46 yrs, 4 mths , 24 dys
Total Mileage 703,792

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 22/03/1958 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 04/1907
THT   Treherbert 4w/e 29/01/1949
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 25/02/1950
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 22/04/1950
88C   Barry 4w/e 21/03/1953
     Withdrawn on 24/08/1953

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 29/01/1949
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 25/02/1950
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 22/04/1950
ALLOC 88C Barry 4w/e 21/03/1953
WDN   m/e 31/08/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
04/1907 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 38
Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 1698
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 285    
29/01/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (THT)    
25/02/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
22/04/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Barry (88C)    
24/08/1953 Withdrawn Condemned as 285    
22/03/1958 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev