30/11/1946 |
Swindon Works |
Locomotives entering works during October and November included 1366, 1409, 1416, 1538, 2017, 2092, 2212, 2411, 2538, 2612, 2708, 2792,2817, 2825, 2836, 2842, 2851, 2859, 2882, 2883, 2884, 2885, 2906, 2927, 2947, 2955,2980, 2987, 2889, 3016, 3026, 3363, 3421, 4038, 4042. 4046, 4052, 4059, 4903, 4934,4953, 4954, 4966, 4973, 5949, 5961, 5989, 5997, 6917, 6922, 6929, 6947, 6959, 70876, 77086, 77326, and 79309 |
SLS/194701 |
31/01/1948 |
Swindon Works |
Locomotives entering Works during January included: Nos. 198, 250, 1009, 1531, 2793, 2859/80/99, 2929/51, 3011/12/44, 3800/07/09/14, 4076/83/87, 4375, 4408, 4542/61,.4854, 4917/87, 5000/01/19/22/30/33/35/48/65/69/75/91/99, 5928/39/46/58/77/94, 6000/03/17/22, 6357/80, 6821/23/62/74, 6906/32, 7001/07, 7308, 9083, W.D. 77005/58/64, 78543/714/717, 79226/34 an 79303. Engines condemned during the same period included Nos. 242, 504, an 3585. Works pilots recently have been: Nos. 198, 905, 1713, an 1781, while 3561 has been on the carriage side. New work: Nos. 6981 , 6982 and 6983 were completed on 20/1, 26/1, and 3/2 respectively; the construction of the 0-6-0 Diesel-electric shunters (Lot 364) is now under way, and the engine of the first one has been mounted on the frames. The first engine to be lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and to bear the prefix 'W' in yellow paint, under the numberplate was No. 4946 , which was ex Works on 8/1 (right-hand side only) and later emerged with both sides done on 16/1. Additional locomotives leaving the Works have been dealt with in various styles, as follows: Nos. 4100, 4217, an 5514 with 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' on the tank sides and prefixed with a yellow 'W' (Subsequently to 26/1, all prefixes have been in white paint). Nos. 1017, 4062, 4084, 4087, an 4951 were lettered 'BRITISH RAILWAYS' and prefixed 'W'; 2880, 5388, 5529, an 6736 with plain tenders and tanks and prefixed with a 'W,' while 2830 carried 'G.W.R.' on the tender and prefixed 'W.' On 23/1 No. 7007 had the old nameplates removed and was renamed Great Western, and on 30/1 No. 7001 emerged from the Works renamed Sir James Milne, with the tender bearing 'G.W.R.' and crest; the number had not been prefixed. All W.D.'s now entering the Works have had the Westinghouse pump removed, presumably at the running sheds |
SLS/194803 |
31/01/1949 |
Swindon Works |
New Work January: Nos. 6996 Blackwell Hall (RDG (4/1)), 6997 Bryn-Ivor Hall (17/1), 6998 Burton Agnes Hall (28/1); 6769 BRY (6/1). Locomotives entering Works 30/12/48 to 28/1/49: These included Nos. p24 (Petrol), 213/46 (Both acting as Works' pilots), 1007/08/19, 1369, 1426/29, 2016 (open cab), 2235/64/94, 2445, 2807/59, 2843, 2942/79/87, 3020/44, 3631/33, 3751, 3811/57 (damaged), 3818/28/55, 4017/41/46/53/59/74/78/79/86, 4122/37, 4225/82,, 4507/10/50/94, 4601, 4801 (Ex-Carriage Stock Shed-for conversion to coal-burning), 4912/15/21/35/58, 5014/27/29/49/57/61/92/93, 5108/34, 5225, 5307/33/48/58, 5502/05/12/31/53/72, 5909/49/61/97 , 6013/23/29, 6104/38/58/66, 6304/07/32/34/59/81, 6432, 6640, 6802/03/64/65/69, 6967, 7412, 7731/62/66/86/87, 7805, 8724/26, 9604/11/53, 9732/53/69, W.D. 77049 (badly damaged), 79279, 79309. Condemned: Nos. *1538, *1713, 2717 (all to Concentration Yard), 1889/97, 2767 (open cab), 2935, 3049, 3446/48, 4320. *After acting as Works' pilot. Further locomotives painted black and fully lined, include Nos. 4900, 5997, 6930/39, while No. 2166 came out black and unlined-with the original boiler again. No. 3020 has had a heavy repair (with a change of boiler), fitted with a smokebox numberplate, but not re-painted |
SLS/194903 |
04/03/1962 |
Swindon Works ('A' Shop) |
Triangle: 1435, 3636, 4123/6, 4929, 5167, 5509/11/49, 6152/3/66, 6348, 7421, 7796, 8441, 8700/79, 9738. Works Yard: D3437, 1009/21/7, 3809/49, 4093, 4632, 4905/44, 5924, 6006, 6408, 6820, 6965/7, 7002/4/27/37, 7306, 8489/94, 8721/33/62/75, 9460, 9765. Weigh House: 5967. 'C' Shop: 8735, 9416. Dump: 1642, 2205/6/30/88, 4207, 5069, 5770, 7771/2, 8451, 8768, 9454/74, 9720. 'A' Shop: D600/2/3, D808, D1002-17, D2182-6, D3035, D3354/6/60/6/97, D3425, D4009, D6315/23/37, 8, 1013/5/9/28, 2516, 2859/73/6, 3440, 4003, 4286, 4920/50, 5026/43/56, 5990/1, 6012, 6821/7/39, 6906/13/36/50/71/3/93, 7001/3/6/13/26, 7226, 7320/37, 7918, 9400, 82040, 92222/37. |
SLS/196204 |
11/02/1964 |
Wolverhampton Works |
The last locomotive to be repaired here was 2859 of PPL and it left the Works with due ceremony; 4153 was still in the Test shed, otherwise no other locomotives were in Works. These officially close 1st June next. |
SLS/196403 |
07/03/1964 |
York MPD |
D1558 new ex-Crewe was seen in York Shed when passing 2-35 p.m. 7th March. |
SLS/196403 |
10/04/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (In sidings at Barry Docks) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 2873, 3612, 3845, 4253, 4270, 4561, 4566, 4588, 5193, 5227, 5521, 5526, 5532, 5538, 5539, 5541, 5542, 5552, 5553, 5557, 5558, 5570, 5572, 5651, 5794, 5814, 5952, 6023, 6024, 6115, 7229, 7722, 7903, 8419, 9462, 9468, 9629, 30541, 30830, 34016, 34027, 34028, 34058, 34067, 34070, 34072, 34073, 34081, 34092, 34105, 35006, 35009, 35018, 35025, 92207, 92245. Behind Barry Works: 2807, 2857, 2861, 2874, 2885, 3803, 3822, 4141, 4247, 4248, 4277, 4930, 4936, 4942, 4953, 4979, 4983, 5029, 5043, 5051, 5080, 5164, 5199, 5224, 5239, 5322, 5619, 5637, 5668, 5900, 5967, 5972, 6619, 6634, 6686, 6692, 6695, 6960, 6989, 7027, 7200, 7202, 7325, 9466, 30499, 30506, 30825, 30828, 30841, 30847, 31618, 31625, 31638, 31806, 31874, 45690, 48431, 53808, 53809. |
SLS/196505 |
05/09/1965 |
Locomotives Stored at Barry (In sidings at Barry Docks) |
In sidings at Barry Docks: 2859, 4156, 5526, 6024, 34067, 44123, 2873, 4157, 5532, 7229, 34070, 44422, 3612, 4160, 5538, 7903, 34072, 45699, 3814, 4253, 5539, 9629, 34073, 3845, 4270, 5541, 34081, 80067, 3862, 4561, 5542, 30541, 34092, 92207, 4110, 4566, 5552, 30830, 34105, 92245, 4115, 4588, 5553, 34016, 35006, 4121, 5193, 5572, 34027, 35009, 4144, 5227, 5952, 34028, 35018, 4150, 5521, 6023, 34058, 35025; Behind Barry Works: 2807, 4930, 5199, 6619, 30499, 45690, 2857, 4936, 5224, 6634, 30506, 48431, 2861, 4942, 5239, 6686, 30825, 53808, 2874, 4953, 5322, 6695, 30828, 53809, 2885, 4979, 5619, 6960, 30841, 31625, 3803, 4983, 5637, 6989, 30847, 31638, 3822, 5029, 5643, 7027, 31618, 4141, 5043, 5668, 7200, 31806, 4247, 5051, 5900, 7202, 31874, 4248, 5080, 5967, 7325, 4277, 5164, 5972, 9466. |
SLS/196510 |
06/02/1966 |
Woodham Bros. Yard, Barry |
5700 0-6-0PT-3612, 3738, 4612, 9629/81/2. 9400 0-6-0PT*9466. 4500 2-6-2T*-4561/6. 4575 2-6-2T*-4588, 5521/6/32/8/9/41/2/52/3/72. 5101 2-6-2T*-4110/5/21/41/4/56/60, 5164/93/9. 5600 0-6-2T-5619/37/68, 5693**, 6619/34/86/96. 4200 2-8-0T*-4247/8/53/70/7. 5205 2-8-0T*-5224/7/39. 7200 2-8-2T*7200/2/29. 4300 2-6-0*-5322, 7325. Hall 4-6-0*-4930/6/42/53/79/83, 5900/52/67/72. Modified Hall 4-6-0*-6989. 7903. Castle 4-6-0*-5029/43/51/80, 7027. King 4-6-0*-6023/4. 2800 2-8-0*-2807/57/9/61/73/4. 2884 2-8-0*-2885, 3802/3/14/7/22/45/50/5/62. Q 0-6-0*-30541. N 2-6-0-31874. U 2-6-0-31618/25/38, 31806. S15 4-6-0*-30499, 30506, 30825/8/30/41/7. WC and BB 4-6-2-34010/6/27/8/39/46/58/67/70/2/3/81/92/105. MN 4-6-2-35005/6/9/18/25. 4F 0-6-0 M.R.*-43924. 4F 0-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44123/422. SMT 4-6-0 L.M.S.R.-44901/5163/293/337/79/491. 8F 2-8-0-48173/431/518/624. S.D.J.R. 7F 2-8-0*-53808/9. Jubilee 4-6-0-45690/9. 4MT 2-6-0 B.R.-76017. 4MT 2-6-4T B1R.-80064/72/9/80/97/8/100/4/5/35/50. 9F 2-10-0-92207/14/9/40/5. Total: 152 locos. NOTES : * These 18 classes extinct on B.R. **5693 previously wrongly listed as 6692, even though latter was working at Stourbridge. The locos. above come from as far apart as Cornwall and Carlisle. |
SLS/196603 |
07/07/1968 |
Locos. at Messrs. Woodhams, Barry Docks |
Locomotives awaiting scrapping at Woodhams yard, Barry: GWR2807/57/59/61/73/4/85, GWR3612, GWR3738, GWR3802/3/14/17/22/45/50/55/62, GWR4110/5/21/41, GWR4150/6/60, GWR4247/8/53/70/7, GWR4561/6/88, GWR4612/68, GWR4920/30/42/53/64/79/83, GWR5029/43/51/80, GWR5164/93/9, GWR5224/7/39, GWR5322, GWR5521/6/32/8/9, GWR5541/2/52/3/62/72, GWR5619/37/68, GWR5900/52/67/94, GWR6023/4, GWR6619/34/88/95, GWR6960/84/9/90, GWR7027, GWR7200/2/29, GWR7325, GWR7802/12/9/20/1/2/7/8, GWR7903/27, GWR9466, GWR9629/81/82, 30499, 30506/41, 30825/8/30/41/7, 31618/25/38, 31806/74, 34007/10/6/27/8/39/46/53/8/9/67/70/2/3/81/92, 34101/5, 35001/5/6/9/10/1/8/22/5/7/9, 41312/3, 42765, 42859, 42968, 43924, 44123, 44422, 44901, 45163, 45293, 45337/79, 45491, 45690/9, 46428/47, 46512/21, 47279/98, 47324/57, 47406/93, 48173, 48431, 48518, 48624, 53808/9, 71000, 73082/96, 73129/56, 75014/69/78/9, 76017, 78018/9/22/59, 80064/72/8/9/80/97/8, 80100/4/5/35/6/50/1, 92085, 92134, 92207/14/9/40/5. A total of 209. 31618 and 43924 are scheduled for private preservation providing sufficient donations are received. |
SLS/196810 |