Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 16 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2091 Week
» 27452 Month
» 260372 Year
» 1925748 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 39 m/e 06/1908
Great Western Railway (1922) 286 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5095
To Service During 06/1908
Withdrawal Mon 02/10/1950
Service Life 42 yrs, 4 mths , 1 dy
Total Mileage 669,201

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 30/12/1950 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1908
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 12/08/1950
88A   Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 31/08/1950
     Withdrawn on 02/10/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC 88A Cardiff Cathays 4w/e 12/08/1950
WDN RYR Radyr m/e 31/10/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1908 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 39
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5095
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 286    
12/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
31/08/1950 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff Cathays (88A)    
02/10/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 286    
30/12/1950 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev