Menu
Quick Search
Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!
In Touch
Donations
Counter
Visitor Statistics
|
» 27 Online
» 1616 Today
» 4163 Yesterday
» 15022 Week
» 68038 Month
» 187565 Year
» 3214418 Total
|
Record: 10235 (26/09/2023)
(Free MySQL Counter)
|
Numbers Carried
Type |
Number |
Date From |
Notes |
Pre TOPS (Pre Tops) |
D290 |
22/08/1960 |
|
TOPS (Tops) |
40090 |
02/1974 |
|
Locomotive Specifics
Class as Built |
40 |
Subclass/Rebuild History |
|
Wheels |
1Co-Co1 |
Builder |
English Electric Vulcan Foundry |
Fittings (as built) |
Train Brakes | Vacuum Brakes fitted | Steam Boiler | Stone OK4625 | Multiple Fitting | Blue Star | Other Details | Disc Route Indicators |
|
To Service |
22/08/1960 to Crewe North (5A) |
Withdrawn |
08/11/1983 |
Time in Service |
23 yrs, 2 mths , 17 dys |
Cut Up |
11/1984 |
Cut At |
Locomotive Works (Doncaster) |
Information |
Overdue for Classifield repair |
Status |
Scrapped |
Liveries Carried - WIP
Code |
Colour |
Date From |
GNP |
All over Green including front of cab |
22/08/1960 |
GFYE |
Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
by 07/1971 |
|
Modifications - WIP
Date Modified |
Order Number |
Modification |
Status |
Charged to Capital |
Charged to Revenue |
Total Cost |
by 06/01/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
|
Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
|
|
02/1974 |
|
Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
|
|
Configuration - WIP
Date |
Configuration |
Description |
Additional |
Diagram |
Source |
22/08/1960 |
vb |
Vacuum brakes, Steam heat |
|
|
|
by 06/01/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
by 30/08/1970 |
vi |
Vacuum brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
02/1974 |
xi |
Dual brakes, Isolated boiler |
|
|
|
|
Summary
Start |
Event |
Details |
Source |
See Also |
22/08/1960 |
To Service |
To service as British Railways number D290 Built at English Electric Vulcan Foundry Allocated to Crewe North (5A) Livery applied: All over Green including front of cab |
|
|
10/09/1960 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
07/03/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Crewe North (5A) |
|
|
11/04/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
18/07/1964 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Edge Hill (8A) |
|
|
09/01/1965 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Rugby (1F) |
|
|
18/04/1966 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Western Lines (LMR) (WL) |
|
|
09/12/1967 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (8F) |
|
|
15/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Longsight (9A) |
|
|
17/06/1968 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Manchester Division (D09) |
|
|
06/01/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
30/08/1970 |
Modification |
Modification: Steam heat boiler isolated |
|
|
07/1971 |
Livery |
Change of livery to Green with full yellow cab front or nose |
|
|
09/10/1971 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Liverpool Division (D08) |
|
|
03/02/1973 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Preston Division (D10) |
|
|
02/1974 |
Modification |
Modification: Air Brakes fitted |
|
|
02/1974 |
Renumbered |
Renumbered to 40090 |
|
|
09/03/1974 |
Allocation |
Reallocated to Springs Branch (Wigan) (SP) |
|
|
08/11/1983 |
Withdrawn |
Condemned as 40090 |
|
|
11/1984 |
Scrapped |
Broken up by Locomotive Works: Doncaster |
|
|