Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 12 Online
» 981 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2055 Week
» 27416 Month
» 260336 Year
» 1925712 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 49 m/e 10/1910
Great Western Railway (1922) 290 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5385
To Service During 10/1910
Withdrawal Tue 26/07/1955
Service Life 44 yrs, 9 mths , 26 dys
Total Mileage 829,727

Disposal
Scrapping 4w/e Sat 10/09/1955 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 10/1910
FDL   Ferndale m/e 30/06/1948
88F   Treherbert 4w/e 24/01/1953
88E   Abercynon 4w/e 21/03/1953
88B   Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1953
     Withdrawn on 26/07/1955

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 29/11/1947
ALLOC FDL Ferndale m/e 30/06/1948
ALLOC 88F Treherbert 4w/e 24/01/1953
ALLOC 88E Abercynon 4w/e 21/03/1953
ALLOC 88B Cardiff East Dock 4w/e 03/10/1953

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
10/1910 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 49
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5385
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 290    
30/06/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Ferndale (FDL)    
24/01/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (88F)    
21/03/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Abercynon (88E)    
03/10/1953 Allocation Reallocated to Cardiff East Dock (88B)    
26/07/1955 Withdrawn Condemned as 290    
10/09/1955 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev