Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 11 Online
» 11 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2086 Week
» 27447 Month
» 260367 Year
» 1925743 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 58 m/e 07/1908
Great Western Railway (1922) 292 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5131
To Service During 07/1908
Withdrawal Thu 10/04/1952
Service Life 43 yrs, 9 mths , 11 dys
Total Mileage 660,238

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 12/07/1952 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1908
CVDLIS     8w/e 23/03/1946
     Withdrawn on 10/04/1952

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC MTHR Merthyr Tydfil 4w/e 23/03/1946
WDN   m/e 30/04/1952

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1908 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 58
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5131
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 292    
23/03/1946 Allocation      
10/04/1952 Withdrawn Condemned as 292    
12/07/1952 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev