Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 10 Online
» 961 Today
» 1074 Yesterday
» 2035 Week
» 27396 Month
» 260316 Year
» 1925692 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 59 m/e 06/1907
Great Western Railway (1922) 293 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Manning, Wardle & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1700
To Service During 06/1907
Withdrawal Fri 27/07/1951
Service Life 44 yrs, 1 mth , 26 dys
Total Mileage 689,952

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 08/09/1951 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 06/1907
CVRYR     8w/e 23/03/1946
RHY   Rhymney m/e 31/03/1948
RYR   Radyr 4w/e 10/07/1948
     Withdrawn on 27/07/1951

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 23/02/1946
ALLOC RHY Rhymney m/e 31/03/1948
ALLOC RYR Radyr 4w/e 10/07/1948
WDN   m/e 31/07/1951

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
06/1907 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 59
Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 1700
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 293    
23/03/1946 Allocation      
31/03/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Rhymney (RHY)    
10/07/1948 Allocation Reallocated to Radyr (RYR)    
27/07/1951 Withdrawn Condemned as 293    
08/09/1951 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev