Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 31 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2106 Week
» 27467 Month
» 260387 Year
» 1925763 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 67 m/e 07/1907
Great Western Railway (1922) 294 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Manning, Wardle & Co.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 1701
To Service During 07/1907
Withdrawal Mon 17/07/1950
Service Life 43 yrs , 17 dys
Total Mileage 587,001

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 24/02/1951 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1907
     Withdrawn on 17/07/1950

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
WDN DYD Duffryn Yard m/e 31/07/1950

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Mentions ...
Report Date Title Report Source
08/10/1950 Swindon Works On the occasion of the visit on 8/10/50, interesting engines were 7925 Westol Hall (83G), 6770, 9429 (RSH.7566/50), 8464 (YEC.2457/50), 7926 (not painted), 7924 Thornycroft Hall; new construction included 7927-7929 an 6771 onwards. The stock shed contained 5 Portishead, 992, 1366/69/71, 2014/7, 2195, 2754, 2894/5, 3453, 3645, 3666, 3866, 4055, 4901/25/56, 5068, 5084, 5086, 5523, 5534, 5700, 5924, 6102/7, 6716, 6915, 6924, 7037 (no name), 7923 Speke Hall; there were two new tanks in the running shed, 8422 an 9428 (RSH.7565/50). On the dump were 46, 281, 294, 422, 428, 1747, 1919, 1949, 1989, 2006, 2022, 2047, 2064, 2716, 2794, 3386, and S. & M. 'Coal Engines' 8108 (8182 & 8236 partly dismantled). It is reported that 8463 (0-6-0T) has no works plate, and that 9427 is RSH. 7564/50, but it may not be generally known that the makers' plates are fixed only to the left side leading splashers on these engines. SLS/195012
18/11/1950 Swindon Works New construction 18/11/50-7820 Dinmore Manor, 7821 (painted), 7822 well forward, 7823-7827 laid down; 6772/4 in shed, 6775 completed and 6776/7 nearly so; 6778/9 laid down: 8466 Y.E. Co. 2459/50, 9432 R.S.H. 7569/50. Being cut up: 2738, 1799, 3168 (?); in the dump 46, 281, 294, 422, 1705/47/89, 1858/70, 1949, 2022/47/64, 2155/89, 2754/60, 3386. SLS/195101

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1907 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 67
Built at Manning, Wardle & Co., Works Number 1701
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 294    
17/07/1950 Withdrawn Condemned as 294    
24/02/1951 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev