Menu

Quick Search

Enter locomotive number in the box below and press 'Go'!

Content is coming here as you probably can see. Content is coming here as you probably can see.


?

Counter

Ad Visitor Statistics
» 3 Online
» 32 Today
» 1001 Yesterday
» 2107 Week
» 27468 Month
» 260388 Year
» 1925764 Total
Record: 2004 (05/06/2021)
(Free MySQL Counter)

Advertising



In Touch

Bookmark and Share

Follow BRDatabase on Twitter
prev prev
Numbers Carried
Company Number Date From
Taff Vale Railway 95 m/e 07/1908
Great Western Railway (1922) 297 4w/e 10/1922

Locomotive Specifics
Designer T. Hurry Riches
Class O4
Company History TVR/GWR
Wheels 0-6-2T
Builder Beyer Peacock Ltd.
Order Number No Order ID issued
Works Number 5096
To Service During 07/1908
Withdrawal Mon 12/12/1949 off Cardiff East Dock (CED)
Service Life 41 yrs, 5 mths , 12 dys
Total Mileage 625,224

Disposal
Scrapping Sat 09/09/1950 at Locomotive Works (Swindon)

Allocations
Code Subsequent Codes Name From Date
    (New) m/e 07/1908
THT   Treherbert 4w/e 26/02/1949
     Withdrawn on 12/12/1949

SLS Allocations*
Type Code Name From Date
ALLOC THT Treherbert 4w/e 26/02/1949
WDN CED Cardiff East Dock m/e 31/12/1949

* Stephenson Locomotive Society data - raw and not yet cross-referenced

Summary
Date Event Details Source See Also
07/1908 To Service To service as Taff Vale Railway Number 95
Built at Beyer Peacock Ltd., Works Number 5096
   
10/1922 Renumbered Renumbered to 297    
26/02/1949 Allocation Reallocated to Treherbert (THT)    
12/12/1949 Withdrawn Condemned as 297 from Cardiff East Dock (CED)    
09/09/1950 Scrapped Broken up by Locomotive Works: Swindon    

prev prev